CRESCENT PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1039644
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 October 2020 08 August 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 October 2020 08 August 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 07 October 2019 08 August 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 October 2019 08 August 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 07 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 October 2018 07 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 07 October 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 07 October 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 07 October 2016 09 August 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 August 2017 2 days late Download