Accounts and annual returns THE INNER WHEEL CLUB OF KIRKBY-IN-ASHFIELD NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 1039837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2021 22 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2020 15 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2019 26 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2018 21 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2017 21 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2017 Not Required