HARROLD PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1039965
Charity reporting is up to date (37 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £68.66k £60.53k £79.80k £78.51k £81.00k
Total expenditure £48.21k £50.95k £61.10k £77.50k £73.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.38k £18.62k N/A £61.29k £53.00k