THE GAUSIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1040011
Charity reporting is overdue by 673 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 673 days
Annual return 01 April 2018 15 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 15 September 2018 226 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 15 September 2018 591 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required