THE GAUSIA MOSQUE AND ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1040011
Charity reporting is overdue by 675 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 24/04/2012 24/04/2013 01/04/2016 01/04/2017 01/04/2018
Total gross income £8.79k £9.16k £8.98k £9.28k £9.47k
Total expenditure £7.32k £7.42k £8.22k £9.13k £9.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A