MOSELEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040045
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £17.84k £9.83k £24.19k £20.35k £19.08k
Total expenditure £28.05k £7.55k £14.87k £29.29k £10.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A