MOSELEY CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1040045
Charity reporting is up to date (19 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Annelise Jensen Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
Gemma Bridgeman Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
Dr GARETH LINCOLN STUTTARD Trustee 01 September 2016 None on record
Rachel Kinning Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
Louisa Joy Horth Trustee 04 November 2020 None on record
AUSTEN EDWARD TURNER Trustee 06 September 2018 None on record
VICTORIA ELIZABETH THOMPSON Chair 07 February 2018 None on record
Amy Ashton Trustee 05 September 2016 None on record