Trustees Haven Tyneside Limited

Charity number: 1040208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nitin Shukla Chair 13 January 2016
ROTARY CLUB OF TYNESIDE TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Connected Voice
Received: On time
ANGELS OF THE NORTH
Overdue by 394 days
Shaun Andrew Cannell Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
Sally Trueman Trustee 17 July 2019
None on record
Russell Hewitson JP, LLB Trustee 09 March 2016
NETHERTON PARK TRUST
Received: On time
MARGARET FERGUSON Trustee 10 February 2016
None on record
IAN MACKINTOSH Trustee 13 January 2016
CITIZENS ADVICE NEWCASTLE
Received: On time
Dr HELEN MOIRA KAY Trustee 13 January 2016
None on record
James William Little Trustee 10 January 2016
None on record
Patrick John Rice Trustee 10 January 2014
None on record