ST JOHNS PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP (CARLTON)

Charity number: 1040402
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £60.15k £80.21k £99.78k £92.67k £80.59k
Total expenditure £62.53k £75.38k £87.93k £98.34k £85.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £45.06k £64.83k £86.64k £82.26k £73.31k