Accounts and annual returns SOLIDARITY AND COMMUNITY FOR ACTION

Charity number: 1040548
Charity reporting is overdue by 389 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 23 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Overdue Overdue by 389 days
Annual return 31 July 2021 18 April 2023 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 19 March 2022 292 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 30 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required