Financial history SOLIDARITY AND COMMUNITY FOR ACTION

Charity number: 1040548
Charity reporting is overdue by 382 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £580 £1.99k £1.58k £11.04k £10.02k
Total expenditure £360 £300 £1.76k £10.26k £9.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.86k N/A