AL-TAWHEED (TUCF) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1040652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 10 December 2020 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 10 December 2020 133 days late Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 21 July 2020 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 13 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 26 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required