AL-TAWHEED (TUCF) CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1040652
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £11.00k £9.96k £16.41k £25.17k £14.53k
Total expenditure £11.09k £16.37k £13.73k £26.63k £16.38k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A