Accounts and annual returns GREEK LANGUAGE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OF HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1040670
Charity reporting is overdue by 296 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 296 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 296 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 01 July 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 July 2021 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 26 October 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 26 October 2019 118 days late Download Open in new window