Financial history GREEK LANGUAGE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OF HERTFORDSHIRE

Charity number: 1040670
Charity reporting is overdue by 291 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £49.69k £48.16k £46.93k £31.34k £43.30k
Total expenditure £57.44k £55.36k £71.54k £39.60k £21.46k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A