ROSEBERRY ACADEMY FRIENDS AND TEACHERS

Charity number: 1040735
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 22 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 11 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 02 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required