Financial history NETLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1040856
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £109.77k £118.09k £119.98k £111.82k £169.69k
Total expenditure £87.89k £136.39k £122.69k £108.69k £125.29k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £28.63k