Accounts and annual returns NETLEY CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1040856
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 13 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 13 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 04 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 03 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window