Financial history BODMIN ROAD COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1041093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021
Total gross income £10.78k £2.29k £6.07k £934 £300
Total expenditure £6.69k £8.97k £7.56k £2.03k £587
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A