Financial history ST BERNADETTES ROMAN CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.24k £10.64k £11.34k £5.66k £4.35k
Total expenditure £4.65k £9.04k £6.28k £12.87k £7.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A