Financial history MARY HARE GRAMMAR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1041326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £2.67k £2.11k £699 £15 £825
Total expenditure £4.31k £705 £502 £136 £966
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A