YMCA St Paul's Group

Charity number: 1041923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Stern Trustee 01 September 2021
WEST LONDON YMCA Received: On time
Helen Gill Posner Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Kenneth Youngman Trustee 20 December 2016 None on record
Carol Delaney Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
Gerald Chifamba Trustee 18 May 2018
WEST LONDON YMCA Received: On time
Andrew Palmer Chair 28 January 2016
THE AHOY CENTRE Received: On time
Graham Beech Trustee 23 January 2020 None on record
Duncan Ingram Trustee 17 May 2019
WEST LONDON YMCA Received: On time
THE CHILDREN'S TRUST Received: On time
Aderonke Savage Trustee 17 May 2019 None on record
Louise Hedges Trustee 14 September 2016 None on record