Accounts and annual returns ST FRANCIS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1042352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 September 2019 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 24 July 2018 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required