Financial history ST FRANCIS PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1042352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £11.70k £23.06k £23.62k £19.86k £12.34k
Total expenditure £19.06k £34.32k £34.19k £16.29k £8.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A