Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF FREEZYWATER ST GEORGES C.E. SCHOOL ENFIELD

Charity number: 1042406
Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 332 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 March 2022 257 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required