MUSIC THEATRE KERNOW

Charity number: 1042568
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £21.68k £7.86k £22.19k £9.33k £17.54k
Total expenditure £19.87k £6.91k £19.65k £8.60k £10.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A