Financial history 1ST MARKFIELD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1042586
Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.35k £9.84k £7.30k £4.90k £14.28k
Total expenditure £9.61k £12.59k £2.63k £6.00k £4.42k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £11.33k