SHADWELL PLAYGROUND CAMPAIGN

Charity number: 1042605
Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £251 £1 £1 £254 £1.51k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A