Trustees BE FREE YOUNG CARERS LTD
Charity number: 1042708
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wells | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Eccleston | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Joanna Broad | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Cole | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mitchell | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurie Cooper | Trustee | 07 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Mary Clare Paris | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Loretta Light | Trustee | 25 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angus Kingsley Horner | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Browne | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.