Financial history SOUTHWARK PLAYHOUSE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1042870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £889.19k £872.92k £1.15m £1.50m £2.16m
Total expenditure £878.26k £892.55k £1.02m £1.02m £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.96k £1.60k £1.90k £300.59k £739.32k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.23k £12.43k £335.24k £648.62k £1.76m
Income - Other trading activities £348.18k £308.79k £320.50k £301.96k £136.57k
Income - Charitable activities £517.31k £538.91k £490.53k £545.15k £209.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £216 £140 £407 £661 £252
Income - Other £6.26k £12.64k £6.04k £7.87k £52.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £623.47k £584.80k £621.24k £712.59k £1.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds £254.79k £307.75k £398.62k £303.11k £181.78k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £9.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0