Accounts and annual returns SOUTHWARK PLAYHOUSE THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1042870
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 22 August 2017 On time Download Open in new window