BELMONT CASTLE ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1043330
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.26k £11.85k £9.23k £10.30k £10.49k
Total expenditure £6.23k £6.63k £7.44k £11.37k £7.94k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A