Financial history THE GREETLAND ACADEMY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1043467
Charity reporting is overdue by 601 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £64.00k £66.89k £61.52k £36.09k £15.39k
Total expenditure £64.00k £66.80k £61.52k £36.99k £30.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A