Financial history THE SOCIETY OF ST JAMES

Charity number: 1043664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.39m £9.99m £10.51m £10.56m £12.02m
Total expenditure £8.29m £9.83m £10.41m £10.43m £11.68m
Income from government contracts £4.51m £5.18m £5.19m £5.37m £6.43m
Income from government grants £0 N/A £167.46k £452.60k £610.28k
Income - Donations and legacies £268.22k £268.13k £142.59k £251.69k £393.65k
Income - Other trading activities £240.24k £276.27k £8.92k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.87m £9.44m £10.35m £10.30m £11.51m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £8.57k £11.14k £9.29k £6.00k £3.02k
Income - Other £6.29k £0 £0 £0 £110.00k
Income - Legacies £300 £0 £5.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.22m £9.79m £10.36m £10.37m £11.61m
Expenditure - Raising funds £65.44k £35.36k £52.49k £65.85k £67.07k
Expenditure - Governance £19.16k £21.55k £17.85k £15.00k £16.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0