Trustees THE SOCIETY OF ST JAMES

Charity number: 1043664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia June Hillary Chair 15 December 2015
None on record
Adnan Chaudry Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Peta Joyce Ash CBE Trustee 05 April 2022
None on record
Alan Davis Trustee 05 October 2021
None on record
Andy Holdup Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Robert James Hollis Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record
Graeme Calder Walker Marshall FCA Trustee 12 October 2017
ENSEMBLE ORQUESTA
Received: On time
Julie Osman Trustee 12 October 2017
None on record
Stephen Andrew Butterfill Trustee 15 October 2015
None on record