Accounts and annual returns MERCIA & MARCHES ROTARY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1043685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 22 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 09 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 20 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required