Financial history MERCIA & MARCHES ROTARY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1043685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £17.93k £14.26k £14.17k £6.94k £2.44k
Total expenditure £15.10k £14.91k £17.51k £6.92k £4.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A