ANIMALS AT RISK SHELTER

Charity number: 1044094
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £191.89k £136.65k £390.79k £169.41k £327.81k
Total expenditure £600.99k £93.42k £236.22k £93.10k £56.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A