Accounts and annual returns NORTH WOOTTON ACADEMY PTA

Charity number: 1044323
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Overdue by 20 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 02 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 02 May 2023 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 27 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 04 November 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required