DISABILITY ACTION YORKSHIRE

Charity number: 1044373
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alison Craggs Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record
NOEL MORIARTY Trustee 02 April 2013 None on record
Michael Barry Patterson Trustee 09 October 2013 None on record
NEIL REVELY Chair 28 July 2016 None on record
Susan Papworth Trustee 26 July 2018
HARROGATE LADIES' COLLEGE LIMITED Received: On time
Andrew Newton Trustee 05 August 2014 None on record