ST MUNGO'S (SIMONBURN) CHURCH BUILDING TRUST

Charity number: 1044385
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £2.81k £2.79k £2.58k £3.99k £4.93k
Total expenditure £717 £755 £806 £817 £817
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A