Accounts and annual returns AL-NOOR YOUTH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1044484
Charity reporting is overdue by 1339 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 243 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 243 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 608 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 608 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 974 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 974 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1339 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1339 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required