Financial history THE FRIENDS OF HAPPISBURGH LIGHTHOUSE

Charity number: 1044590
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £27.89k £20.65k £27.00k £24.79k £5.64k
Total expenditure £24.60k £23.92k £26.70k £28.42k £4.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A