FAMILY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 1045025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.01m £1.74m £1.48m £1.65m £1.70m
Total expenditure £2.21m £1.93m £1.33m £1.34m £1.47m
Income from government contracts £1.42m £1.18m £822.67k £805.49k £891.52k
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £42.80k £35.46k £35.21k £182.75k £5.26k
Income - Other trading activities £135.80k £97.62k £0 £0 £227.32k
Income - Charitable activities £1.82m £1.60m £1.30m £1.31m £1.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.04k £3.95k £2 £18 £120
Income - Other £0 £0 £148.76k £160.11k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.08m £1.85m £1.29m £1.33m £1.43m
Expenditure - Raising funds £33.02k £24.00k £11.59k £13.41k £34.32k
Expenditure - Governance £28.65k £7.43k £6.30k £6.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £95.28k £54.80k £27.43k £0 £0