Financial history WEST OXFORD ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1045203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £54.62k £56.02k £64.70k £126.93k £36.82k
Total expenditure £52.30k £53.90k £55.40k £74.70k £43.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A