AL BADR ISLAMIC TRUST

Charity number: 1045362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.48m £1.83m £1.69m £1.64m £1.64m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.25m £1.28m £1.52m £1.55m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £127.45k £266.45k £205.70k £260.16k £261.14k
Income - Other trading activities £87.26k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.25m £1.46m £1.42m £1.35m £1.32m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.81k £30.81k £56.09k £27.27k £64.98k
Income - Other £0 £70.42k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.29m £1.25m £1.28m £1.52m £1.55m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £4.72k £7.70k £4.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £6.71k £0 £66.87k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0