THE GREEN ALLIANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1045395
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £1.20m £1.58m £1.61m £1.95m £2.21m
Total expenditure £1.49m £1.61m £1.58m £1.75m £1.81m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £40.00k £84.00k
Income from government grants £0 £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £107.34k £76.79k £78.79k £64.19k £181.14k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.09m £1.51m £1.52m £1.88m £2.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.63k £699 £1.67k £1.67k £370
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.47m £1.58m £1.54m £1.70m £1.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £24.60k £34.05k £35.62k £57.09k £112.80k
Expenditure - Governance £22.18k £32.16k £33.31k £31.32k £34.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0