THE GREEN ALLIANCE TRUST

Charity number: 1045395
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Claire Craig Trustee 13 December 2016 None on record
DAVID BALDOCK Trustee 28 September 2016
THE HOLLYCOMBE WORKING STEAM MUSEUM LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
ZEPHYR CHARITABLE TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
EARTH RESOURCES RESEARCH LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Rosemary Jane Celia Boot Trustee 10 December 2014 None on record
Dr Craig Lindsay Bennett Trustee 19 May 2020 None on record
DAME FIONA CLAIRE REYNOLDS DBE Chair 08 December 1998
CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY MUSICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
THE MASTER FELLOWS AND SCHOLARS OF EMMANUEL COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE Charity reporting is up to date
Paul Lambert Trustee 21 September 2017 None on record
Rita Clifton CBE Trustee 17 July 2018
THE FORUM FOR THE FUTURE Charity reporting is up to date
SIR GRAHAM ROBERT WYNNE CBE, MA Trustee 23 March 2011 None on record
BEN CALDECOTT Trustee 09 March 2010 None on record
Benet Northcote Trustee 17 July 2018
UK CENTRE FOR ECOLOGY & HYDROLOGY Recently registered
ALISON MARY AUSTIN OBE Trustee 23 September 2015 None on record