ST HUGH'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (TIMPERLEY) PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045500
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £51.31k £48.15k £63.18k £51.03k £66.58k
Total expenditure £27.79k £26.26k £39.07k £30.41k £45.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A