Accounts and annual returns THE WINDSOR ROYAL FREE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1045518
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 07 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 16 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 25 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required